Financial history ASYLUM WELCOME

Charity number: 1092265
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £450.70k £386.53k £417.98k £747.98k £1.26m
Total expenditure £446.59k £421.25k £403.58k £601.38k £1.07m
Income from government contracts £109.23k N/A N/A £93.31k £433.50k
Income from government grants £0 £79.02k £68.81k £93.31k £41.45k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £747.82k £1.26m
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £163 £73
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 £5.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £504.71k £959.94k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £96.67k £107.87k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £0 £6.69k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 £4.00k
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £0