ASYLUM WELCOME

Charity number: 1092265
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Susan Ni Chriodain Trustee 16 September 2019 None on record
Abdoul Ma Aly Diallo Trustee 22 January 2020 None on record
Lucy Keating Trustee 13 September 2021 None on record
Linda Guma Bond Trustee 22 January 2020 None on record
Clare Miller Trustee 03 December 2018 None on record
Tony Samuel Trustee 05 September 2016 None on record
David Levy Trustee 13 September 2021
THE CONVERSATION TRUST (UK) LIMITED Received: On time
GREEN TEMPLETON COLLEGE Received: On time
Thomas Paul Espley Trustee 04 January 2019 None on record
Valerie Ann Johnson Trustee 06 December 2018 None on record
Tina Leonard Trustee 05 September 2016 None on record