LONDON SOUTH EAST COUNTY GUIDE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1091992
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £27.13k £33.79k £36.41k £26.19k £24.88k
Total expenditure £24.55k £34.78k £25.94k £29.03k £19.43k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A