THE MILESTONE SOCIETY

Charity number: 1105688
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £5.20k £32.32k £19.91k £4.94k £7.46k
Total expenditure £3.39k £42.54k £7.68k £11.99k £6.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £900 N/A N/A N/A