HARTLIP PRE SCHOOL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide quality childcare and prepare children for school in a safe, stimulating environment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Kent
Governance
- 15 May 2002: Standard registration
- 05 November 2017: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- 05 November 2017: Funds transferred to 1038393 STEPPING STONES PRE-SCHOOL
- HARTLIP PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2012 | 31/08/2013 | 31/08/2014 | 31/08/2015 | 31/08/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £64.26k | £67.16k | £57.58k | £58.67k | £56.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £68.48k | £61.79k | £62.73k | £52.53k | £57.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £15.22k | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2016 | 25 April 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 August 2016
(These accounts |
25 April 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2015 | 21 March 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2015 | 21 March 2016 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2014 | 12 January 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2014 | 12 January 2015 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25/03/2002 AS AMENDED ON 23/11/2011
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window