THEIRWORLD

Charity number: 1092312
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Theodosia Sowa CBE Trustee 30 May 2021 None on record
ARABELLA HELEN WEIR Trustee
SUNNYSIDE COMMUNITY GARDENS Received: On time
Professor Neena Modi Trustee 11 July 2019
DAVID HARVEY TRUST Received: On time
ACADEMY OF MEDICAL SCIENCES Received: On time
ACTION CEREBRAL PALSY Received: On time
LUCY DOUGHTY Trustee 11 December 2012
THE DOUGHTY FAMILY FOUNDATION Received: On time
GALILEO FOUNDATION Received: 77 days late
Ian Laing Trustee 10 December 2015 None on record
DAVID JOHN BOUTCHER Trustee None on record
SARAH JANE BROWN Chair 10 December 2012 None on record
Ben Hewitt Trustee 01 December 2018 None on record