RECORD, THE BIODIVERSITY INFORMATION SYSTEM FOR CHESHIRE, HALTON, WARRINGTON AND WIRRAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Various tasks and facilities pertaining to the collection, verification, management, storage and dissemination of biological/biodiversity data within the Cheshire region, including training in the identification of species, information on recording via a website which also delivers data and species mapping to the public and the education sector and beyond.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £50,036 from 4 government contract(s) and £35,180 from 2 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
43 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Halton
- Warrington
- Wirral
Governance
- 06 February 2003: Standard registration
- RECORD (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR TONY PARKER | Chair |
|
||||||
John Galbraith Buchanan | Trustee | 16 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Matthew Geary | Trustee | 14 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
HELEN Bradshaw | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £80.77k | £97.77k | £135.94k | £133.47k | £154.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £84.36k | £101.64k | £114.31k | £139.45k | £186.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £14.25k | £26.51k | £50.04k | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.02k | £14.74k | £10.02k | N/A | £35.18k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 March 2024 | 43 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 14 March 2024 | 43 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 February 2021 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 10 February 2021 | 10 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 3 AUGUST 2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 29 OCTOBER 2002.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN ALL AREAS RELATING TO BIODIVERSITY (TERRESTRIAL, FRESHWATER AND MARINE SPECIES TO THE 12 MILE LIMIT, HABITATS AND SITES) IN CHESHIRE, HALTON, WARRINGTON AND WIRRAL (HEREINAFTER REFERRED TO AS THE "AREA OF BENEFIT") BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: A. THE COLLATING, STORAGE, MANAGEMENT AND DISSEMINATION OF BIODIVERSITY INFORMATION; B. CONDUCTING, ENCOURAGING AND PROMOTING RESEARCH INTO BIODIVERSITY AND DISSEMINATING THE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH; OFFERING TRAINING AND AWARENESS RAISING PROGRAMMES RELATING TO BIODIVERSITY WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
CHESHIRE, HALTON, WARRINGTON, WIRRAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 5
Parade Enterprise Centre
14 The Parade
Blacon
CHESTER
CH1 5HN
- Phone:
- 01244394514
- Email:
- info@record-lrc.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window