1ST GREAT NOTLEY SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide activities for young people between the ages of 6 and 18 years, by promoting a scheme of awards using a fun and interesting format. These involve both personal and group challenges. There are weekly meetings for different ages, run by trained volunteer adults together with helpers. Visits to places of interest, educational trips and camps are also included.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Essex
Governance
- 22 May 2002: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jody Etherington | Trustee | 09 May 2024 |
|
|||||
Bethany Smith | Trustee | 12 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ann Elizabeth Quartermain | Trustee | 12 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Simon Staken Mr | Trustee | 12 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Matthew John Paterson | Trustee | 12 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Ashworth | Trustee | 07 November 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £38.82k | £7.64k | £10.68k | £23.90k | £20.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £36.95k | £8.38k | £12.97k | £26.67k | £26.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 May 2024 | 104 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2020
(These accounts |
06 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER GRANTED 4TH JANUARY 1912, AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTERS DATED 28TH MARCH 1949, 18TH FEBRUARY 1959, 5TH MAY 1967 AND 19TH JULY 1991.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN ACHIEVING THEIR FULL POTENTIALS, AS INDIVIDUALS, AS RESPONSIBLE CITIZENS AND AS MEMBERS OF THEIR LOCAL, NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL COMMUNITIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 Highclere Road
Great Notley
BRAINTREE
Essex
CM77 7WX
- Phone:
- 01245442237
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window