THE GRACE PROJECT(INCORPORATING ABUNDANT LIFE CHURCH)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promote authentic christianity through education and outreach programmes and to further the christian and other general charitable work.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Ealing
Governance
- 23 October 2002: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID BERESFORD GRANT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PAUL ANTHONY ANDERSON-WALSH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
STUART GORDON PENDRED | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £418 | £360 | £360 | £360 | £793 | |
|
Total expenditure | £393 | £220 | £421 | £344 | £548 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 21 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 24 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 17 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 23RD APRIL 2002 AND AS AMENDED ON 1ST OCTOBER 2002
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION AND TO FURTHER THE RELIGIOUS AND OTHER GENERAL CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHURCH WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
61 BRIDGE STREET
KINGTON
Herefordshire
HR5 3DJ
- Phone:
- 02089313338
- Email:
- hayley@thegraceproject.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window