CLWYD ME SUPPORT GROUP

Charity number: 1093178
Removed charity
Governing document
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11/03/2002 AS AMENDED ON 29/06/2002 AS AMENDED ON 18/04/2011
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF ME SUFFERERS IN FLINTSHIRE, WREXHAM, DENBIGHSHIRE AND CONWY AND THE PROMOTION OF RESEARCH INTO ME AND THE PUBLICATION OF THE USEFUL RESULTS OF THAT RESEARCH.
Organisation type
Other
Registration history
  • 29 July 2002 : registered
  • 14 September 2018 : removed (CEASED TO EXIST)
Other names

No other names

What the charity did
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
Who the charity helped
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helped
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research