Financial history ST THOMAS A BECKETT NURSERY SCHOOL LIMITED

Charity number: 1097448
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £132.65k £135.58k £135.58k £149.65k £139.97k
Total expenditure £120.49k £136.79k £136.79k £135.35k £126.56k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £117.97k £117.97k N/A £140.05k N/A