Financial history HASTINGS AND BEXHILL MENCAP SOCIETY

Charity number: 1092206
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £968.39k £886.10k £1.04m £1.01m £968.86k
Total expenditure £834.62k £830.20k £912.28k £828.35k £891.95k
Income from government contracts £506.70k £500.51k £713.86k £644.99k £554.55k
Income from government grants £1.50k £1.86k £1.73k £153.31k £87.97k
Income - Donations and legacies £103.95k £60.46k £52.24k £234.15k £113.61k
Income - Other trading activities £63.38k £62.53k £61.69k £14.46k £56.13k
Income - Charitable activities £798.27k £760.46k £917.08k £763.82k £797.24k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.29k £2.66k £4.00k £1.12k £1.58k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £300
Income - Legacies £93.92k £22.43k £0 £21.78k £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £811.31k £803.58k £895.79k £817.70k £879.98k
Expenditure - Raising funds £23.31k £26.62k £16.49k £10.65k £11.97k
Expenditure - Governance £3.36k £3.36k £3.36k £3.36k £3.36k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0