MARSDEN JAZZ FESTIVAL LIMITED

Charity number: 1097200
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 26 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 26 October 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 05 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 05 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 18 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 18 July 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 17 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 17 May 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 15 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 15 September 2017 On time Download