CHURCHES TOGETHER IN WILLENHALL

Charity number: 1093921
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £29.20k £24.96k £29.47k £29.70k £39.89k
Total expenditure £24.14k £26.52k £28.75k £31.62k £28.20k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £17.63k