Dogfen lywodraethu UKSG
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 23/01/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/08/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11/03/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/04/2010 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 25/04/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09/04/2013 as amended on 20 Jan 2020
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN THE ART AND SCIENCE OF LIBRARIANSHIP AND DATA RECALL WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO THE MANAGEMENT AND CLASSIFICATION OF SERIALS AND SIMILAR PERIODICALS, BOTH NATIONALLY AND INTERNATIONALLY, AND THE CONDUCT OF RESEARCH INTO THE SAID SUBJECT, AND TO PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH;
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE UNITED KINGDOM AND IRELAND
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.