Accounts and annual returns MBI AL JABER FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1093439
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2021 20 April 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 03 June 2021 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 29 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2018 28 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2017 21 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 Not Required