KIDS CARE LONDON

Charity number: 1096406
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2020 COVID filing extension granted
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 COVID filing extension granted
Annual return 30 November 2019 31 October 2020 31 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 31 October 2020 31 days late Download
Annual return 30 November 2018 29 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2018 29 September 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 November 2017 06 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2017 06 June 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 November 2016 03 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2016 03 July 2017 On time Download