CAPEL ST MARY SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The School Association organsises social and fundraising events. Funds raised are then allocated through grants, to enrich the life of the school and the pupils' learning.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 20 October 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Suffolk
Governance
- 21 June 2002: Standard registration
No other names
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Francesca Marie Aldous | Trustee | 11 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lindsey Ellen Woods | Trustee | 11 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jenna Marie Jordan | Trustee | 11 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christine Ranson | Trustee | 11 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kez Wilson | Trustee | 27 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER WOODWARD | Trustee | 01 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Green | Trustee | 21 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Blumsum | Trustee | 06 September 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 20/10/2019 | 20/10/2020 | 20/10/2021 | 20/10/2022 | 20/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.64k | £5.19k | £1.55k | £2.79k | £6.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.69k | £7.13k | £4.65k | £662 | £2.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 20 October 2023 | 16 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 20 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 20 October 2022 | 15 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 20 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 20 October 2021 | 04 October 2022 | 45 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 20 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 20 October 2020 | 15 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 20 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 20 October 2019 | 23 March 2021 | 215 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 20 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18 MARCH 2002
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY 1. DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN STAFF PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; 2. ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS;
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE CAPEL ST MARY CEVC PRIMARY SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 Two Acres
Capel St. Mary
IPSWICH
IP9 2XP
- Phone:
- 01473310696
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window