BEACONSFIELD OLD CHURCH SCHOOL CHARITY

Charity number: 1092747
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 21 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 08 May 2019 24 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 08 May 2019 24 February 2020 On time Download
Annual return 08 May 2018 26 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 08 May 2018 Not Required
Annual return 08 May 2017 19 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 08 May 2017 Not Required
Annual return 10 May 2016 10 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 10 May 2016 Not Required