BEACONSFIELD OLD CHURCH SCHOOL CHARITY

Charity number: 1092747
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 10/05/2016 08/05/2017 08/05/2018 08/05/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £17.99k £20.37k £21.75k £25.94k £20.61k
Total expenditure £18.94k £22.43k £31.45k £19.60k £26.10k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A