THE AIM PROJECT

Charity number: 1097853
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 03 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 03 September 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 30 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 30 September 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 05 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 05 November 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 29 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 29 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 12 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 12 December 2017 On time Download