Accounts and annual returns THE AXE VALLEY COMMUNITY COLLEGE PARENT TEACHER FRIEND ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1094703
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 September 2021 22 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 01 September 2020 01 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 01 September 2019 06 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 01 September 2018 06 January 2020 189 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 01 September 2017 22 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2017 Not Required