ALTARS MEDICAL SUPPORT

Charity number: 1097338
Charity reporting is overdue by 960 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 229 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 229 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 595 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 595 days
Annual return 31 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 960 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 960 days
Annual return 31 March 2017 22 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 31 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required