ALTARS MEDICAL SUPPORT

Charity number: 1097338
Charity reporting is overdue by 1001 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017
Total gross income £1.40k £1.60k £1.51k £1.21k £0
Total expenditure £1.40k £1.56k £1.51k £1.21k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £0