THE PHILIP BATES TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Musical concerts and supporting young people in the Arts
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Birmingham City
- Coventry City
- Solihull
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 05 December 2002: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SUSAN BATES | Chair |
|
||||||||||
Sarah Elaine Dudley | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Alexander John Moulton | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
JOHN SAUNDERS QC | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
JILL ROBINSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
RACHEL MARGARET BATES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
ALISON PERRIER-BURGESS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
Karen Lesley Ellen Moulton | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.54k | £8.30k | £5.12k | £5.39k | £2.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.70k | £6.36k | £5.72k | £4.30k | £4.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 12 November 2024 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 01 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 26 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 2 FEBRUARY 2002 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 18 OCTOBER 2002.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE UNDER THE AGE OF 25 IN THE ARTS BY: 1. THE PROVISION OF AWARDS TO ENCOURAGE AND SUPPORT THEIR PURSUIT OF CREATIVE AND ARTISTIC ACHIEVEMENT AND; 2. THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL SUPPORT TO PROJECTS OR WORKSHOPS WHICH AIM TO DEVELOP CREATIVE AND ARTISTIC INTERESTS AND SKILLS IN YOUNG PEOPLE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
17 Marlborough Way
MARKET HARBOROUGH
Leicestershire
LE16 7LW
- Phone:
- 07853841619
- Email:
- moulton.k@icloud.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window