THE KINGSLAKES CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Grants given for the benefit of the inhabitants of Tamworth and surrounding district; and organisations for relief-in-need, nationally and internationally, at the absolute discretion of the Trustees
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Staffordshire
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 10 July 2002: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lesley Louise Gilman | Trustee | 13 June 2018 |
|
|||||
Stephen James Turner | Trustee | 30 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Howard Amedeo Johnson | Trustee | 05 May 2015 |
|
|||||
JOHN CHRISTOPHER O'CONNOR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BARBARA KINGSLAKE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £114.85k | £137.51k | £170.88k | £170.96k | £180.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £122.00k | £137.60k | £147.60k | £139.51k | £167.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 16 APRIL 2002
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL STAND POSSESSED OF THE TRUST FUND AND THE INCOME THEREOF UPON TRUST TO PAY APPLY OR APPROPRIATE THE INCOME AND THE WHOLE OR ANY PART OR PARTS OF THE CAPITAL THEREOF AT ANY TIME OR FROM TIME TO TIME TO PROMOTE SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF TAMWORTH AND THE DISTRICT BOUNDED BY AND INCLUDING THE VILLAGES OF EDINGALE CLIFTON CAMPVILLE NO MAN'S HEATH AUSTREY GRENDON KINGSBURY MIDDLETON WEEFORD WHITTINGTON AND ELFORD IN THE COUNTIES OF STAFFORDSHIRE AND WARWICKSHIRE (AS SHOWN FOR THE PURPOSES OF IDENTIFICATION ONLY ON THE PLAN ANNEXED HERETO) AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE..
Area of benefit
TAMWORTH AND THE DISTRICT BOUNDED BY INCLUDING VILLAGES OF EDINGALE CLIFTON CAMPVILLE NO MAN'S HEATH AUSTREY GRENDON KINGSBURY MIDDLETON WEEFORD WHITTINGTON AND ELFORD WARWICK
Contact information
- Address:
-
Lawnswood
Bowmer Lane
Fritchley
BELPER
DE56 2FY
- Phone:
- 07850614410
- Email:
- christine.gilbert@mail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window