Financial history STONEWALL EQUALITY LIMITED

Charity number: 1101255
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 31/03/2021
Total gross income £7.02m £7.25m £8.70m £8.32m £11.55m
Total expenditure £6.07m £7.49m £8.79m £9.12m £12.77m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £394.72k £655.67k £610.59k £702.30k £1.87m
Income - Donations and legacies £1.74m £1.33m £2.73m £1.74m £2.33m
Income - Other trading activities £6.31k £3.53k £504.90k £1.12m £0
Income - Charitable activities £4.89m £5.46m £5.00m £5.41m £9.21m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £59.74k £47.29k £52.94k £46.10k £14.97k
Income - Other £321.75k £406.11k £417.11k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £155.21k £96.61k £181.70k £377.75k £425.41k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.99m £6.22m £7.22m £7.50m £10.83m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.09m £1.27m £1.57m £1.62m £1.94m
Expenditure - Governance £22.27k £48.95k £40.36k £0 £58.36k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0