Trustees STONEWALL EQUALITY LIMITED
Charity number: 1101255

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Iain Anderson | Chair | 16 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tabatha O'Brien-Butcher | Trustee | 16 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sadiq Gillani | Trustee | 16 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Meredith Jacqueline Alice Williams | Trustee | 30 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gbolahan Faleye | Trustee | 30 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kyle Shea Ring | Trustee | 30 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tayibatu Alao | Trustee | 30 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mx Louise Elizabeth Downe | Trustee | 30 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jean Vianney Cordeiro | Trustee | 16 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ayla Zoe Louise HOLDOM | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Dixon | Trustee | 25 July 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.