Trustees THE LEE ABBEY MOVEMENT

Charity number: 1094098
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
REV DR GRAHAM ROBERT CAPPLEMAN Chair 04 April 2013
ST ALBANS WOODLAND BURIAL TRUST
Received: On time
LEE ABBEY FELLOWSHIP
Received: On time
LEE ABBEY INTERNATIONAL STUDENTS' CLUB
Received: On time
LEE ABBEY HOUSEHOLD COMMUNITIES
Received: On time
LEE ABBEY FELLOWSHIP
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARK, BEDFORD
Received: On time
THE ST ALBANS DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: 6 days late
Andrew Wooding Jones Trustee 31 March 2023
LEE ABBEY HOUSEHOLD COMMUNITIES
Received: On time
Philip Park Trustee 31 March 2023
None on record
Rev Robert Mark Eastwood Dewing Trustee 04 December 2021
ARCHDEACONRY OF BATH CLERICAL FAMILIES FUND
Received: On time
KATHARINE CHAPPELL CHARITY TRUST
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF PORTISHEAD
Received: On time
Rev Paul Anthony van Rossum Trustee 01 March 2019
LEE ABBEY INTERNATIONAL STUDENTS' CLUB
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY'S, ALMONDSBURY
Received: On time
Rev David Charles Roland Widdows Trustee 13 April 2018
LEE ABBEY FELLOWSHIP
Received: On time
Revd Dr Lynda Brigid Taylor Trustee 13 April 2018
LEE ABBEY INTERNATIONAL STUDENTS' CLUB
Received: On time
Dr MARGARET ANNE PAUL Trustee 07 July 2016
None on record
SUSAN MARGARET EDMONDSON Trustee 03 December 2015
LEE ABBEY HOUSEHOLD COMMUNITIES
Received: On time
Rev JOHN HAROLD SIMMONS Trustee 05 December 2014
THE GREENHILL FELLOWSHIP TRUST
Received: On time
THE MOSS CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE FOURWAYS TRUST
Received: On time
THE BOURNEMOUTH CHEST DISEASES CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: 63 days late
THE SLAVANKA TRUST
Received: On time
THE GREAT WOOD TRUST
Received: On time
CANFORD SCHOOL LIMITED
Received: On time
PROF ALEXANDER ANTHONY PEPPER Trustee 06 September 2013
LEE ABBEY INTERNATIONAL STUDENTS' CLUB
Received: On time
SISTER SUSAN PATRICIA BERRY CSF Trustee
ANGLICAN RELIGIOUS COMMUNITIES IN ENGLAND
Received: On time
Rev JAMES KEITH STUART DENNISTON Trustee
None on record