LITTLE MILTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1092878
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Linda Lovegrove Trustee 11 June 2019 None on record
Mary Harrison Trustee 11 June 2019 None on record
Mark Willis Trustee 12 December 2017 None on record
Giles Denby Trustee 11 June 2019 None on record
Steve Willis Trustee 07 January 2020 None on record
Graham Bibby Trustee 01 August 2019 None on record
Maggie Wheeller Trustee 07 September 2016 None on record
Alison Valance Trustee 12 March 2018 None on record
Linda Bibby Trustee 11 June 2019 None on record
KAY WARD Trustee 08 November 2016 None on record