THE MANNA HOUSE (TAMWORTH) CO

Charity number: 1093988
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 03 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 03 June 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2019 22 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 22 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2018 11 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 11 February 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2017 17 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 17 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2016 07 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 12 December 2016 On time Download