THE UPTON CHURCH TRUST

Charity number: 1095830
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £5.07k £4.85k £1.78k £3.60k £2.92k
Total expenditure £3.79k £4.15k £4.75k £2.06k £3.89k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A