Trustees THE RAMBLERS' ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 1093577
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rebecca Dawson | Chair | 02 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rowan Patricia Williams | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm Alistair Dingwall-Smith | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gavin Maurice Arthur Baker | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Hodgson | Trustee | 30 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Daniel Jordan Firmager | Trustee | 12 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gulshun Rehman | Trustee | 11 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rebekah Helene Cork | Trustee | 09 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Frances Armitage | Trustee | 09 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Bola Atinuke Anike | Trustee | 09 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Isobel Robinson | Trustee | 17 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mark Eugene Chung | Trustee | 17 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ronnie Forbes | Trustee | 08 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Michael Penny | Trustee | 08 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm John McDonnell | Trustee | 08 April 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.