Financial history THE FRIENDS OF BORDEN CHURCH

Charity number: 1094542
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £7.19k £9.04k £7.95k £2.17k £4.28k
Total expenditure £2.20k £3.12k £4.68k £1.57k £6.26k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A