Financial history AIRFIELD VOLUNTEER FIRE SERVICE

Charity number: 1094593
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £26.39k £43.29k £2.34k £3.53k £5.13k
Total expenditure £21.39k £62.26k £346 £574 £4.35k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A