Financial history THE UK CAREER ACADEMY FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1092891
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £2.39m £2.81m £3.56m £2.41m £2.94m
Total expenditure £2.37m £2.78m £3.06m £2.69m £2.92m
Income from government contracts £303.97k £107.50k £119.56k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £303.97k £107.50k N/A £159.37k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.69m £2.36m £3.04m £2.06m £2.51m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £700.34k £454.79k £504.94k £188.70k £420.97k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.11k £1.43k £7.46k £6.23k £5.96k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £159.37k £4.19k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.23m £2.56m £2.79m £2.44m £2.62m
Expenditure - Raising funds £140.26k £219.47k £268.79k £251.50k £305.16k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £58.15k £46.18k £82.09k £82.66k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0