BARNABAS FUND

Charity number: 1092935
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £13.63m £14.04m £14.40m £14.18m £16.57m
Total expenditure £13.62m £14.69m £14.00m £14.36m £16.55m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £8.55k
Income - Donations and legacies £13.62m £14.03m £14.37m £14.17m £15.84m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £3.87k £4.00k £3.56k £4.08k £4.60k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £7.92k £3.23k £12.21k £6.15k £5.49k
Income - Other £0 £0 £14.72k £71 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £253.51k £707.53k £622.19k £491.32k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £13.31m £14.42m £13.67m £14.16m £16.35m
Expenditure - Raising funds £307.00k £271.05k £328.81k £195.33k £201.63k
Expenditure - Governance £13.98k £16.01k £14.20k £19.66k £13.93k
Expenditure - Grants institution £11.81m £13.04m £0 £12.71m £14.99m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0