BARNABAS FUND

Charity number: 1092935
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Caroline Julia Chenevix Kerslake Trustee 09 September 2014
OXFORD CENTRE FOR RELIGION AND PUBLIC LIFE Received: 19 days late
Rev ALBRECHT BERNHARD HAUSER Trustee
TBF TRUST Received: On time
SERVANTS FELLOWSHIP INTERNATIONAL Received: On time
THE RECONCILIATION TRUST Received: On time
Rev I McNaughton Trustee 25 February 2014 None on record
Rev Vinay Samuel Trustee 15 October 2014 None on record
Simon Reading Lord Chair 01 March 2016
EXPLOITS Received: On time
DESIRING TRUTH MINISTRIES Received: On time
PRAYER NETWORK UK Received: On time
CLUBFOOT INDIA (UK) Received: 3 days late
Andrew Carey Trustee 01 April 2019 None on record
Rosemary Anne Sookhdeo Trustee 09 September 2014
OXFORD CENTRE FOR RELIGION AND PUBLIC LIFE Received: 19 days late