THE MARION GASKELL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of scholarships and prizes for certain students in arts subjects at Wigan and Leigh College.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Bolton
- Knowsley
- Lancashire
- Manchester City
- Salford City
- Warrington
- Wigan
Governance
- 16 September 2002: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PHILIP ARTHUR JOHN GARSIDE | Trustee |
|
||||||
MICHAEL GEORGE HAGERTY | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.85k | £3.66k | £4.22k | £4.91k | £6.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.11k | £12.22k | £9.47k | £7.75k | £6.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 04 June 2024 | 120 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 03 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL PROVED AT LIVERPOOL PROBATE REGISTRY ON 18 DECEMBER 1998.
Charitable objects
FOR THE PROMOTION AND ENCOURAGEMENT OF EDUCATION IN ART AT THE WIGAN COLLEGE OF TECHNOLOGY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
28 DERBY STREET
ORMSKIRK
LANCS
L39 2BY
- Phone:
- 01695573202
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window