LEEDS SUDANESE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1095816
Charity reporting is overdue by 1541 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2008 30/09/2009 30/09/2010 30/09/2011 30/09/2012
Total gross income £41.25k £5.07k £51.33k £18.41k £680
Total expenditure £31.27k £22.52k £36.21k £31.64k £12.92k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A