PRISONERS ABROAD

Charity number: 1093710
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £1.60m £1.53m £1.77m £1.78m £1.81m
Total expenditure £1.59m £1.71m £1.72m £1.75m £1.77m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £628.57k £605.47k £759.00k
Income from government grants £534.77k £542.65k £628.57k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.60m £1.53m £1.77m £1.78m £1.79m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.31k £964 £388 £788 £821
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £22.50k
Income - Legacies £90.65k £26.07k £57.10k £142.42k £200
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.30m £1.39m £1.41m £1.41m £1.44m
Expenditure - Raising funds £291.33k £320.12k £314.10k £337.61k £325.66k
Expenditure - Governance £19.72k £19.88k £16.46k £23.28k £24.66k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0