Accounts and annual returns THE CECIL GRANT FOUNDER'S TRUST FOR ST GEORGE'S SCHOOL

Charity number: 1094822
Charity reporting is overdue by 29 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2023 Overdue Overdue by 29 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Overdue Overdue by 29 days
Annual return 05 April 2022 25 January 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 25 January 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2021 27 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 27 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 21 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 21 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2019 08 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 22 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window