Accounts and annual returns Association of Upper Gastrointestinal Surgery of Great Britain and Ireland

Charity number: 1093090
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2021 21 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 21 March 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2020 15 April 2021 15 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 15 April 2021 15 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2019 30 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 30 March 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2018 28 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 28 March 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2017 27 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017 27 February 2018 On time Download Open in new window