Financial history Association of Upper Gastrointestinal Surgery of Great Britain and Ireland

Charity number: 1093090
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020 31/05/2021
Total gross income £631.89k £673.02k £562.91k £546.42k £256.39k
Total expenditure £603.92k £516.56k £484.49k £564.67k £246.11k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Other trading activities £221.88k £150.16k £187.13k £200.41k N/A
Income - Charitable activities £409.78k £522.77k £368.28k £342.39k N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment £232 £95 £95 £1.56k N/A
Income - Other £0 £0 £7.40k £2.06k N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £603.92k £516.56k £484.49k £564.67k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Governance £31.40k £31.63k £33.21k £26.94k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A