Trustees Association of Upper Gastrointestinal Surgery of Great Britain and Ireland

Charity number: 1093090
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

21 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Richard Laing Trustee 01 April 2021
None on record
Arin Saha Trustee 01 December 2019
None on record
Stuart Andrews Trustee 01 December 2019
None on record
Cynthia-Michelle Borg Trustee 01 March 2019
The British Obesity and Metabolic Surgery Society
Received: On time
Iain Cameron Trustee 01 September 2018
None on record
Naheed Farooq Trustee 01 September 2018
None on record
Keith Roberts Trustee 01 September 2018
None on record
Krishnamurthy Ravi Trustee 01 September 2018
None on record
Matthew Forshaw Trustee 01 September 2018
None on record
Dinesh Sharma Trustee 01 December 2017
None on record
Robert O'Neill Trustee 01 September 2017
None on record
Robert Jones Trustee 01 July 2017
None on record
NICHOLAS MAYNARD Trustee 23 September 2016
OXFORDSHIRE OESOPHAGEAL AND STOMACH ORGANISATION
Received: On time
Bhaskar Khumar Trustee 23 September 2016
None on record
James Gossage Trustee 08 January 2016
None on record
Simon Galloway Trustee 20 September 2014
None on record
Andrew Smith Trustee 20 September 2014
None on record
RICHARD JOSEPH KRYZSTOPIK Trustee 17 September 2014
None on record
STEPHEN FENWICK Trustee 01 September 2014
BOWEL CANCER UK
Received: On time
MARK TAYLOR Trustee 01 September 2012
None on record
GILES TOOGOOD Trustee
None on record