Accounts and annual returns THE MICHAEL UREN FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1094102
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 28 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 28 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 29 March 2021 52 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 29 March 2021 52 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2019 17 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 17 December 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2018 16 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 16 November 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2017 05 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 05 December 2017 On time Download Open in new window