Financial history THE MICHAEL UREN FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1094102
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £2.49m £5.01m £4.31m £2.57m £4.65m
Total expenditure £18.13m £6.88m £7.51m £8.03m £3.48m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.83m £4.00m £3.53m £1.88m £134.94m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £132.79m
Income - Investment £660.79k £1.01m £775.66k £690.01k £2.50m
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £2.15m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £18.13m £6.88m £7.51m £8.02m £3.48m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £307.61k £6.19k £0 £19.93k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £17.83m £6.87m £0 £0 £3.48m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £19.93k £0