THE ORRELL TRUST

Charity number: 1096549
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2020 22 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 22 February 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2019 12 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 12 February 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2018 04 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 04 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2017 08 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

08 November 2017 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2016 25 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

25 January 2017 On time Download