THE ORRELL TRUST

Charity number: 1096549
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
LINDA JANE HEATON Trustee None on record
Dennis Tyrrell Trustee 23 January 2018 None on record
Paulette Sheridan Trustee 12 May 2014 None on record
John Forrest Chair 09 September 2015 None on record
Rev ANDREW STOTT Trustee 24 July 2018 None on record
Lorraine Webb Trustee 12 May 2014 None on record
Rev Alan Finch Trustee 28 January 2020 None on record
Susan Margaret Green Trustee 10 June 2014 None on record