THE KITE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Kite Trust exists to promote the health, well-being and inclusion of lesbian, gay, bisexual and transgender (LGB&T) young people across the whole of Cambridgeshire. We provide direct support to young people to empower them to overcome any barriers they face growing up and tackle the impact of prejudice and discrimination. We raise awareness, challenge and educate in all areas of our work.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2021
Total income includes £15,500 from 1 government contract(s) and £40,774 from 3 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 16 April 2003: Standard registration
- 29 November 2021: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 29 November 2021: Funds transferred to 1189936 THE KITE TRUST
- SEXYOUALITY (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £124.51k | £247.10k | £236.92k | £228.40k | £284.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £124.87k | £202.71k | £238.35k | £244.02k | £177.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £72.43k | N/A | N/A | £26.00k | £15.50k | |
|
Income from government grants | £9.00k | £82.01k | £40.50k | £9.50k | £40.77k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 12 October 2021 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 12 October 2021 | On time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 17 December 2020 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 17 December 2020 | On time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 29 January 2020 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 29 January 2020 | On time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 26 January 2019 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | 26 January 2019 | On time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23 MAY 2002 AS AMENDED 27 FEBRUARY 2003. AS AMENDED ON 17 JAN 2010
Charitable objects
I. TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE GOOD HEALTH, AND IN PARTICULAR THE PHYSICAL, SEXUAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF PERSONS WHO ARE LESBIAN, GAY, BISEXUAL AND PERSONS IN DOUBT OF THEIR SEXUAL IDENTITY. II. TO RELIEVE THE MENTAL AND EMOTIONAL CRISES BY YOUNG PEOPLE AGED 25 OR UNDER, WHO ARE LESBIAN, GAY AND BISEXUAL OR IN DOUBT OF THEIR SEXUALITY BY THE GIVING OF ADVICE, HELP AND INFORMATION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window